SB419 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 19, 2015.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to services for persons with disabilities. (BDR 38-978)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 286.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 06, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 08, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 06, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 20, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 387     Amend. No. 674     Amend. No. 794   

Bill History

Mar 19, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 387.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2015

Apr 20, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 13, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 674.) To printer.

May 14, 2015

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2015

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 19, 2015

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 794.) To printer.

May 20, 2015

May 21, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 674 and 794 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 286.

Effective July 1, 2015.