AB422 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2015.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions governing the operation and equipment of motorcycles and mopeds. (BDR 43-1073)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 20, 2015     11:45 AM          Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 02, 2015     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 24, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Transportation     Apr 30, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 07, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 16, 2015   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 17, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 20, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2015

  • Read second time.

Apr 08, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 10, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2015

Apr 17, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 08, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2015

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 12, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 13, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 14, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 19, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.

Effective October 1, 2015.