SB57 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions concerning access to public records by offenders subject to the jurisdiction of the Department of Corrections. (BDR 16-342)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jan 27, 2015     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 12, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 17, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 25, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)