SB59 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 20, 2014.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to the state business portal. (BDR 7-448)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 04, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb 05, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 13, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 02, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 30, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Government Affairs     May 06, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Judiciary     May 08, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 13, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 09, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 40,   Nay 1,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 132     Amend. No. 691   

Bill History

Dec 20, 2014

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 22, 2014

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 23, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 02, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 03, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 132.) To printer.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 07, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 09, 2015

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 10, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 20, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 691.) To printer.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 26, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 691 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 521.

Effective July 1, 2015.