AB136 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 11, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison, Wheeler, Fiore, Dickman, Moore, Seaman, Titus

Makes various changes relating to wildlife. (BDR 45-561)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 03, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 24, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 05, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May 07, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 03, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 17, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 175     Amend. No. 700   

Bill History

Feb 11, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Feb 12, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 17, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 30, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 175.) To printer.

Apr 02, 2015

Apr 03, 2015

Apr 06, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 12, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 13, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 700.) To printer.

May 14, 2015

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 19, 2015

  • Senate Amendment No. 700 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 21, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 206.

Effective July 1, 2015.