IP2 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 02, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)

Revises provisions relating to the sale or transfer of firearms.

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 09, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 02, 2015

  • Received from Secretary of State.
  • Read first time.
  • Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 09, 2015

  • From committee: Without recommendation.

Mar 10, 2015

  • Read second time.

Mar 11, 2015

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Mar 13, 2015

  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

On 2016 ballot pursuant to Article 19, section 2 of the Nevada Constitution.