SB162 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 16, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson

Revises provisions relating to insurance. (BDR 57-950)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 26, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 22, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 15, 2015     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 01, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 23,   Nay 18,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 67   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 17, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 31, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 67.) To printer.

Apr 01, 2015

Apr 03, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 20, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 269.

Effective May 28, 2015.