SB176 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 19, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer, Gustavson, Goicoechea

Revises provisions governing certain dangerous or deadly weapons. (BDR 15-87)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 314.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 27, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 22, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 13, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 08, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 21, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 203   

Bill History

Feb 19, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 20, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 07, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 203.) To printer.

Apr 08, 2015

Apr 10, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 20, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 21, 2015

May 22, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 314.

Effective July 1, 2015.

On August 10, 2015, the Legislative Commission approved a correction to the enrolled bill pursuant to NRS 218D.720.