SB252 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2015.
By: Revenue and Economic Development

Revises provisions governing the state business license fee. (BDR 32-1185)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 12, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 18, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 18, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Committee of the Whole     Mar 19, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Committee of the Whole     Mar 23, 2015     04:00 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 24, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 26, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 27, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Mar 31, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 07, 2015     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 14, 2015     02:50 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 05, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     May 07, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 21, 2015     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 25, 2015     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2015   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 221   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Mar 12, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 19, 2015

  • From committee: Without recommendation.

Mar 20, 2015

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Mar 23, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Re-referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 221.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2015

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2015

Apr 24, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 11, 2015

  • Waiver granted effective: May 11, 2015.

Jun 02, 2015

  • (No further action taken.)