SB444 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing civil actions. (BDR 3-1137)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 428.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2015     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 24, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2015   Yea 38,   Nay 3,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
Jun 01, 2015 01: 30 PM Conference Report


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 346     Amend. No. 861     Amend. No. CA11   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 24, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 346.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 16, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 861.) To printer.

May 22, 2015

May 25, 2015

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 861 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 28, 2015

  • In Assembly.

May 31, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 861 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 01, 2015

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 861 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 02, 2015

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 428.
  • Effective June 8, 2015.