SB469 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Finance

Makes a supplemental appropriation to the Supreme Court of Nevada for an unanticipated shortfall in revenue for Fiscal Year 2014-2015 resulting from a deficit in the collection of administrative assessments. (BDR S-1228)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 25, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 17, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 05, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2015     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 20, 2015   Yea 19,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 11, 2015   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 25, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 29, 2015

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 17, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 20, 2015

Apr 21, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 06, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 07, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 08, 2015

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2015

May 12, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 13, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.

Effective May 13, 2015.