SB94 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 30, 2015.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ford

Makes various changes relating to transferable tax credits for film and other productions. (BDR 32-58)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Feb 20, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 09, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 30, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Taxation     May 14, 2015     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 25, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 15, 2015   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 20, 2015   Yea 34,   Nay 7,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 434   

Bill History

Jan 30, 2015

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Feb 01, 2015

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2015

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 434.) To printer.

Apr 15, 2015

Apr 16, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

May 18, 2015

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 19, 2015

  • Read second time.

May 20, 2015

May 21, 2015

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 27, 2015

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 232.

Effective July 1, 2015.