Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

78th (2015) Session
Bills Effective January 1, 2017



This list contains those bills which take effect on January 1, 2017, either in part or as a whole.


AB6 Revises provisions relating to autism spectrum disorders. (BDR 54-67)
  Sections 1 to 12, inclusive, 14, 16, 18, 20, 22, 24, 25, and 26 of this act effective May 25, 2015. Sections 13, 15, 17, 19, 21, and 23 of this act effective January 1, 2017.

AB66 Revises provisions relating to justice courts. (BDR 1-492)
  Sections 1, 1.3, 2, 2.4, 3, 4, and 5 of this act effective October 1, 2015. Sections 1.7, 2.2, 2.6, and 2.8 of this act effective on January 1, 2017.

AB191 Revises provisions governing taxes on fuels for motor vehicles. (BDR 32-667)
  Sections 2, 16 to 19, inclusive, and 20 of this act effective June 5, 2015. Sections 1, 4, 7, 9, and 12 of this act effective on November 9, 2016, if the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to NRS 373.0663, as amended by section 2 of this act, is approved by a majority of the registered voters in Clark County voting on the question. Sections 3, 4.5, 6, 7.5, 9.5, 11, 12.5, 14, and 14.5 of this act effective on January 1, 2017, if: (a) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to NRS 373.0663, as amended by section 2 of this act, is not approved by a majority of the registered voters in Clark County voting on the question; and (b) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to section 17 of this act is approved by a majority of the registered voters in any county in this state voting on the question. Sections 3, 5, 6, 8, 10, 11, 13, 14, and 15 of this act effective on January 1, 2017, if: (a) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to NRS 373.0663, as amended by section 2 of this act, is approved by a majority of the registered voters in Clark County voting on the question; and (b) the question placed on the ballot at the general election on November 8, 2016, pursuant to section 17 of this act is approved by a majority of the registered voters in any county in this state voting on the question.

SB111 Requires the use of portable event recording devices by certain peace officers employed by the Nevada Highway Patrol Division of the Department of Public Safety. (BDR 43-618)
  Sections 6.5 and 7 effective June 11, 2015. Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, effective June 11, 2015, for the purpose of adopting policies and procedures governing the use of portable event recording devices and January 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Section 6.3 effective July 1, 2015.

SB153 Revises provisions relating to occupational diseases. (BDR 53-635)
  Sections 2, 3, 6 and 7 effective June 8, 2015. Sections 1.5, 2.5 and 3.5 effective January 1, 2017.

SB250 Revises provisions relating to policies of health insurance. (BDR 57-687)
  Effective June 5, 2015, for the purposes of adopting any regulations and performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2017, for all other purposes.

SB404 Makes certain changes concerning registration of mopeds. (BDR 43-1016)
  Effective June 2, 2015, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and for all other purposes, on January 1, 2017; or the date on which the Director of the Department of Motor Vehicles, pursuant to section 15.9 of this act, notifies the Governor and the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau that sufficient resources are available to enable the Department to carry out the amendatory provisions of this act, whichever occurs first.




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo