Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

78th (2015) Session
Bills Effective July 1, 2016



This list contains those bills which take effect on July 1, 2016, either in part or as a whole.


SB95 Revises provisions governing the publication of property tax rolls. (BDR 32-630)
  Sections 1 and 2 effective July 1, 2015. Section 1.5 effective July 1, 2016.

SB107 Requires certain oversight of and reporting concerning children placed in specialized foster homes. (BDR 38-194)
  Sections 1 to 3.6, inclusive, and 4 to 8, inclusive, effective July 1, 2015. Section 3.7 effective July 1, 2016, and expires by limitation July 1, 2021.

SB394 Revises provisions relating to the protection of children. (BDR 38-264)
  Effective May 27, 2015, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act. Sections 1 to 13, inclusive, 18 and 19 effective January 1, 2016, for all other purposes. Sections 14 and 15 effective July 1, 2016, for all other purposes. Sections 16 and 17 effective July 1, 2020, for all other purposes.

SB412 Provides for a credit against taxes imposed on certain employers that make a matching contribution to certain college savings plans. (BDR 32-1033)
  Sections 1 to 4, inclusive, and 11 effective June 8, 2015, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2016, for all other purposes. Sections 5, 6, 9 and 10 effective June 8, 2015, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2016, for all other purposes.

SB483 Revises provisions relating to governmental financial administration. (BDR 32-1182)
  Sections 103 to 112, inclusive, and 114 effective June 9, 2015. Sections 1 to 78, inclusive, and 79 to 102, inclusive, effective June 9, 2015 for the or the purpose of performing any preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2015, for all other purposes. Sections 78.1 and 78.7 effective July 1, 2015. Sections 78.3 and 78.8 effective July 1, 2016. Sections 78.5 and 78.9 effective July 1, 2017.

SB508 Revises provisions governing the Nevada Plan. (BDR 34-1184)
  Sections 2, 4, 5, 7, 9, 12, 14, 16.5, 17, 18, 19, 21, 22, 24, 26 to 29, inclusive, and 31 effective June 11, 2015. Sections 1, 3, 6, 8, 10, 15, 20, 23, 25 and 30 effective July 1, 2016. Sections 11, 13 and 16 effective July 1, 2017.

SB509 Makes various changes to provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-1090)
  Sections 52, 57 and 58 effective June 10, 2015. Sections 1 to 15, inclusive, 17, 18, 19, 21, 22, 23, 25 to 28, inclusive, 30, 32, 34, 35, 36, 38, 39, 40, 42 to 51, inclusive, effective June 10, 2015, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2016, for all other purposes. Section 56 effective July 1, 2016, if, and only if, Assembly Bill No. 448 of this session is enacted and becomes effective. Sections 16, 20, 24, 29, 31, 33, 37, 41, 53, 54 and 55, inclusive, effective January 1, 2020.




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2017 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo