Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

78th (2015) Session
Resolutions delivered to the Secretary of State




Assembly Joint Resolutions

AJR1 Enrolled on: May 19, 2015 File No. 28
  Recognizes the strategic partnership and bond of friendship with, and expresses the Nevada Legislature's support for, the State of Israel. (BDR R-525)

AJR2 Enrolled on: May 13, 2015 File No. 22
  Urges the United States Congress and the United States Fish and Wildlife Service to take certain actions to reduce the impact of common ravens on the greater sage grouse and desert tortoise populations in this State. (BDR R-33)

AJR3 Enrolled on: Mar 12, 2015 File No. 10
  Urges Congress to facilitate the payment of contractors who completed hazardous fuels treatment projects in the Lake Tahoe Basin pursuant to contracts with the Nevada Fire Safe Council. (BDR R-431)

AJR4 Enrolled on: May 21, 2015 File No. 29
  Urges Congress to enact legislation allowing states to establish daylight saving time as the standard time throughout the calendar year. (BDR R-583)

AJR8 Enrolled on: May 29, 2015 File No. 36
  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require approval of certain initiative measures by a two-thirds vote. (BDR C-916)

AJR10 Enrolled on: Jun 3, 2015 File No. 40
  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the compensation of certain elected officers. (BDR C-1068)


Assembly Concurrent Resolutions

ACR1 Enrolled on: Feb 11, 2015 File No. 7
  Adopts the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-941)

ACR2 Enrolled on: Feb 13, 2015 File No. 8
  Provides for the voluntary transfer of a portion of Legislators' salaries to the State General Fund. (BDR R-958)

ACR3 Enrolled on: Apr 1, 2015 File No. 13
  Honors Nevadans who have lost their lives in the Global War on Terrorism. (BDR R-202)

ACR4 Enrolled on: May 18, 2015 File No. 26
  Memorializes former Assemblyman Joseph “Joe” Michael Hogan, Sr. (BDR R-1260)

ACR5 Enrolled on: May 18, 2015 File No. 27
  Memorializes former Assemblyman Peter L. “Pete” Livermore. (BDR R-1259)


Assembly Resolutions

AR1 Enrolled on: Feb 5, 2015 File No. 1
  Adopts the Assembly Standing Rules for the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-943)

AR2 Enrolled on: Feb 5, 2015 File No. 2
  Provides for the appointment of Assembly attaches. (BDR R-946)

AR3 Enrolled on: Feb 5, 2015 File No. 3
  Provides allowances to the members of the Assembly for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-947)

AR4 Enrolled on: Feb 26, 2015 File No. 9
  Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1203)

AR5 Enrolled on: Mar 23, 2015 File No. 12
  Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1262)

AR6 Enrolled on: Apr 8, 2015 File No. 14
  Provides for the appointment of additional attaches for the Assembly. (BDR R-1267)

AR7 Enrolled on: Apr 29, 2015 File No. 19
  Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1271)

AR8 Enrolled on: May 13, 2015 File No. 23
  Adds former Assemblyman Alan H. Glover to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1274)

AR9 Enrolled on: May 13, 2015 File No. 24
  Adds former Assemblywoman Peggy Pierce to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1273)

AR10 Enrolled on: Jun 1, 2015 File No. 38
  Designates certain members of the Assembly as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2015-2017 biennium. (BDR R-1285)


Senate Joint Resolutions

SJR1 Enrolled on: May 21, 2015 File No. 30
  Urges Congress to enact legislation transferring title to certain public lands to the State of Nevada in accordance with the report prepared by the Nevada Land Management Task Force. (BDR R-451)

SJR2 Enrolled on: May 21, 2015 File No. 31
  Urges Congress to require the sharing of federal receipts from commercial activity on certain public lands with the State of Nevada and its counties. (BDR R-452)

SJR4 Enrolled on: May 21, 2015 File No. 32
  Urges Congress to enact the Marketplace Fairness Act. (BDR R-98)

SJR5 Enrolled on: May 21, 2015 File No. 33
  Expresses support for the 2014 Nevada Greater Sage-Grouse Conservation Plan developed by the Sagebrush Ecosystem Council and urges the United States Fish and Wildlife Service not to list the greater sage-grouse as endangered or threatened under the Endangered Species Act of 1973. (BDR R-480)

SJR11 Enrolled on: May 7, 2015 File No. 20
  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to preserve the right to hunt, trap and fish in this State. (BDR C-1001)

SJR13 Enrolled on: Jun 8, 2015 File No. 41
  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to limit the total amount of certain property taxes that may be levied on real property. (BDR C-1004)

SJR17 Enrolled on: May 30, 2015 File No. 37
  Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to expand the rights guaranteed to victims of crime. (BDR C-952)

SJR21 Enrolled on: May 28, 2015 File No. 35
  Urges Congress to enact comprehensive immigration reform. (BDR R-1266)


Senate Concurrent Resolutions

SCR2 Enrolled on: May 22, 2015 File No. 34
  Encourages education of medical care providers and first responders regarding caring for persons with Alzheimer's disease. (BDR R-237)

SCR3 Enrolled on: Mar 18, 2015 File No. 11
  Temporarily suspends subparagraph (1) of paragraph (d) of subsection 1 of Joint Standing Rule No. 14.2. (BDR R-1261)

SCR7 Enrolled on: Apr 20, 2015 File No. 15
  Authorizes the State Public Works Division of the Department of Administration to receive and use federal grant money for the demolition of the field maintenance shop at the Nevada National Guard Henderson Armory. (BDR R-1263)

SCR8 Enrolled on: May 8, 2015 File No. 21
  Commemorates the 30th anniversary of the sister-state relationship between the State of Nevada and Taiwan. (BDR R-1265)


Senate Resolutions

SR1 Enrolled on: Feb 5, 2015 File No. 4
  Adopts the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-942)

SR2 Enrolled on: Feb 5, 2015 File No. 5
  Provides allowances to the members of the Senate for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-944)

SR3 Enrolled on: Feb 5, 2015 File No. 6
  Recognizes the appointment of the Senate session staff. (BDR R-945)

SR4 Enrolled on: Apr 27, 2015 File No. 16
  Inducts Dean Rhoads into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1268)

SR5 Enrolled on: Apr 27, 2015 File No. 17
  Inducts Terry Care into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1270)

SR6 Enrolled on: Apr 27, 2015 File No. 18
  Inducts Randolph J. Townsend into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1269)

SR7 Enrolled on: May 13, 2015 File No. 25
  Adopts new Standing Rules of the Senate for the remainder of the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-1275)

SR8 Enrolled on: Jun 1, 2015 File No. 39
  Designates certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2015-2017 biennium. (BDR R-1286)




Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo