SB432 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2015.
By: Finance

Provides for the distribution of money to certain public schools designated as Victory schools. (BDR S-1187)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Mar 26, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 02, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Education     Apr 07, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Apr 09, 2015     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr 24, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr 30, 2015     05:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 04, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 05, 2015     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 16, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Education     May 18, 2015     01:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Education     May 19, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     May 20, 2015     03:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Education     May 21, 2015     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2015     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2015     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 15, 2015   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 30, 2015   Yea 33,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 509     Amend. No. 731     Amend. No. 933   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2015

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2015

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2015

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 509.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 16, 2015

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 13, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 14, 2015

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 731.) To printer.

May 15, 2015

May 18, 2015

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 28, 2015

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 29, 2015

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 933.) To printer.

May 30, 2015

May 31, 2015

  • In Senate.

Jun 01, 2015

  • Assembly Amendment No. 933 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2015

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 389.
  • Effective June 8, 2015.