Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

79th (2017) Session
Bill Draft Request List
06/05/17



BDR List Home

Viewing All New Bill Draft Requests: BDR 1236 - 1251


BDR


REQUESTER


 


DATE


37-1236
AB521

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Assembly Minority Leader
Revises provisions governing veterans services.




5/29/2017
Ch. 449

1237

Legislative Counsel
Revises provisions relating to legislative procedure.




6/04/2017


S-1238
AB519

Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes an appropriation from the State General Fund to the Secretary of State for voting machines.




5/30/2017
Ch. 447

R-1239
SCR10

Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
SCR: Creates an interim study of transportation and transportation infrastructure.




5/30/2017


S-1240
SB549

Senate Committee on Finance
Makes appropriation from the State General Fund to the Division of State Library, Archives and Public Records of the Department of Administration for certain services, technology and projects.




5/30/2017
Ch. 465

34-1241
SB547

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Senate Majority Leader
Provides dedicated funding stream for teacher salary programs.




5/18/2017


S-1242
SB551

Senate Committee on Finance
Establishes for the 2017-2019 biennium the subsidies to be paid to the Public Employees' Benefits Program for insurance for certain active and retired public officers and employees.




5/14/2017
Ch. 476

S-1243
AB520

Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Makes an appropriation from the State General Fund to the Nevada State Museum LV to renovate and expand the playground at Springs Preserve.




6/01/2017
Ch. 448

S-1244
SB553

Senate Committee on Finance
Authorizes and provides funding for advance planning for the College of Engineering, Academic and Research Building at the University of Nevada, Las Vegas.




6/01/2017
Ch. 601

1245

Legislative Counsel
Revises provisions relating to legislative procedure.




6/04/2017


S-1246
AB522

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Speaker of the Assembly
Makes an appropriation to the Nevada Teach Program.




6/02/2017
Ch. 607

58-1247
SB554

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Senate Majority Leader
Revises provisions relating to professional entities.




6/02/2017
Ch. 582

32-1248
SB555

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Senate Majority Leader
Joint Requester: Senator Roberson, Assemblyman Frierson, Assemblyman Paul Anderson
Enhances Nevada Educational Choice Scholarship Program.




6/04/2017
Ch. 600

S-1249

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Speaker of the Assembly
Revises provisions governing state employees.




6/05/2017


S-1250

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Speaker of the Assembly
Provides funding for Boys and Girls Clubs.




6/05/2017


R-1251
ACR12

EMERGENCY REQUEST of Speaker of the Assembly
ACR: Revises the Joint Standing Rules for the 79th Legislative Session.




6/05/2017
File 44



Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Employment Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us |   


© Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo