AB102 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 03, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pickard, Cohen

Revises certain provisions relating to the proper venue in civil actions. (BDR 2-591)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 16   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • From printer.
  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 16.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 64.

Effective October 1, 2017.