AB105 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Thompson

Revises continuing education requirements relating to suicide prevention and awareness for certain providers of health care. (BDR 54-32)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 05, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Education     May 30, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 586     Amend. No. 762   

Bill History

Feb 07, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 586.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 05, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 08, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 762.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 19, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 762 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 176.

Effective May 26, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.