AB108 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oscarson

Provides for the periodic review of Medicaid reimbursement rates. (BDR 38-209)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 44.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 22, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 13, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 17, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 07, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 08, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 44.

Effective July 1, 2017.