AB109 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison, Goicoechea

Revises provisions relating to public utilities. (BDR 58-622)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 22, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 546   

Bill History

Feb 07, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)