AB110 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 07, 2017.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing education. (BDR 34-327)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Feb 27, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 23, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 221     Amend. No. 679     Amend. No. 931   

Bill History

Feb 07, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 221.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 679.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 931.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 931 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 509.

Effective June 9, 2017, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act, and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.