AB113 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spiegel

Requires certain employers to make certain accommodations for a nursing mother. (BDR 23-7)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
In Assembly. To enrollment.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 27, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 172   

Bill History

Feb 07, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 172.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.