AB115 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus

Authorizes a physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse to perform certain services. (BDR 40-98)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 27, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 24, 2017

  • Withdrawn from committee.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)