AB116 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Titus

Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses to perform certain acts required to be performed by a physician or certain other providers of health care. (BDR 54-497)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 27, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 02, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 27, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)