AB126 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Abolishes certain committees. (BDR 38-555)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 283.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 24, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 03, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 19, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 08, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 820   

Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 08, 2017

Mar 09, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 820.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 820 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 283.

Effective July 1, 2017.