AB129 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 09, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Tolles

Revises provisions relating to the practice of optometry and the issuance of a prescription for an ophthalmic lens. (BDR 54-744)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Feb 09, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)