AB135 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 10, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to prohibited acts concerning the use of marijuana and the operation of a vehicle or vessel. (BDR 43-598)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 76.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 03, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 34,   Nay 4,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 390   

Bill History

Feb 10, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 13, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 390.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 23, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 76.

Effective July 1, 2017.