AB138 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 10, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Authorizes the de minimus collection of precipitation under certain circumstances. (BDR 48-445)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 272.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 14, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 04, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Natural Resources     May 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Natural Resources     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 135     Amend. No. 898   

Bill History

Feb 10, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Feb 13, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 135.) To printer.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 898.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 898 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 272.

Effective July 1, 2017.