AB14 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 15, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Requires the submission of a complete set of fingerprints with certain petitions and court orders relating to a legal name change and citations for domestic violence. (BDR 3-172)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 15, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 13, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 18   

Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 05, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 18.) To printer.

Apr 06, 2017

Apr 10, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66.

Effective July 1, 2017.