AB145 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Krasner, Bustamante Adams, Bilbray-Axelrod, Carrillo, Joiner, Kramer, Titus, Tolles, Watkins, Wheeler, Woodbury, Denis, Cannizzaro, Gansert, Gustavson, Harris, Kieckhefer

Extends the statute of limitations for certain civil actions for damages for injuries incurred as a child as a result of sexual abuse or pornography. (BDR 2-584)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 111.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 12, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 25, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 25     Amend. No. 702   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 25.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 702.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 702 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 111.

Effective May 24, 2017.