AB146 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Watkins, Ohrenschall

Enacts the Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Domestic-Violence Protection Orders Act. (BDR 3-617)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes      Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard in joint hearing, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 26, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 14, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 639   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 10, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 14, 2017

Mar 15, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 639.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 639 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 137.
  • Effective July 1, 2017, and applies to a Canadian domestic-violence protection order issued before, on or after July 1, 2017, and to a continuing action for enforcement of a Canadian domestic-violence protection order commenced before, on or after July 1, 2017.