AB156 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Yeager, Oscarson

Authorizes public and private schools to obtain and use an albuterol inhaler in certain circumstances. (BDR 40-581)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 220   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 220.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)