AB175 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McCurdy II, Flores, Carrillo, Brooks, Diaz, Joiner, Monroe-Moreno

Prescribes certain requirements for health benefits for the purpose of determining the minimum wage paid to employees in private employment in this State. (BDR 53-866)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 20, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 22, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 31, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 02, 2017     09:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 540     Amend. No. 903     Amend. No. 1098   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 540.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 23, 2017

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 903.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1098.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1098 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Return to 2019 Session.