AB177 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sprinkle

Revises provisions relating to domestic violence. (BDR 3-210)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 230.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 15, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 15, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 18, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 54   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 54.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 230.

Effective May 31, 2017.