AB18 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 15, 2016.
By: Commerce and Labor

Ratifies the Nurse Licensure Compact. (BDR 54-182)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 08, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Feb 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 14, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)