AB181 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Frierson, Ohrenschall, Yeager, Araujo, Benitez-Thompson, McCurdy II

Revises provisions governing the restoration of civil rights for certain ex-felons. (BDR 14-720)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 362.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 24, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 30, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 31, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 393     Amend. No. 760   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 24, 2017.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 393.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 18, 2017

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 760.) To printer.

May 19, 2017

May 22, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 31, 2017

Jun 01, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 362.

Effective January 1, 2019.