AB20 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to services to assist persons with disabilities in obtaining employment. (BDR 38-225)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Feb 17, 2017     12:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 26, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 13, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 27   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 05, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 27.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 18, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 67.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.