AB209 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oscarson

Revises provisions governing the forfeiture of water rights. (BDR 48-308)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 147.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 14, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 350   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 350.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 147.

Effective July 1, 2017.