AB214 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Neal

Establishes a program to increase participation by certain demographic groups in clinical trials. (BDR 40-707)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 142.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 26, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 13, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 41     Amend. No. 671   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 41.) To printer.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 671.) To printer.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 671 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 142.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.