AB227 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carrillo

Makes changes relating to domestic partnerships. (BDR 11-784)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 72.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb 27, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     May 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 05, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 13, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2017

Apr 17, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 72.

Effective July 1, 2017.