AB244 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 27, 2017.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to certain insurance gratuities. (BDR 57-95)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Upcoming Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy      May 05, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda   

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 06, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 45   

Bill History

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Feb 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 45.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.