AB249 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 01, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Frierson, Bilbray-Axelrod, Sprinkle, Benitez-Thompson, Yeager, Elliot Anderson, Araujo, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Carrillo, Cohen, Daly, Diaz, Flores, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Neal, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Swank, Thompson, Watkins

Requires the State Plan for Medicaid and all health insurance plans to provide certain benefits relating to contraception. (BDR 38-858)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 553.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-15-17   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
Jun 03, 2017 07: 00 PM Conference Report


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 429     Amend. No. 751     Amend. No. 966     Amend. No. CA3   

Bill History

Mar 01, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 02, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 429.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 751.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 966.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 30, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 751 not concurred in.
  • Senate Amendment No. 966 concurred in.
  • To Senate.

May 31, 2017

  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 751 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 966 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 553.

Effective January 1, 2018.