AB253 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 03, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to adjudications of mental health. (BDR 39-688)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 397     Amend. No. 761   

Bill History

Mar 03, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 06, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 397.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 761.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 761 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 309.

Effective July 1, 2017.