AB259 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McCurdy II, Monroe-Moreno, Thompson, Ohrenschall, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Fumo, Miller, Parks, Cancela, Segerblom, Ratti

Revises provisions relating to certain criminal convictions and sentences. (BDR 14-657)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar 14, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 16, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Apr 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 09, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 17, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 337     Amend. No. 787   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Mar 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 337.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 787.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 787 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

Return to 2019 Session.