AB26 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Corrections, Parole, and Probation

Revises provisions governing the dissemination of certain records of criminal history to certain persons by the Central Repository for Nevada Records of Criminal History. (BDR 14-138)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Feb 14, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Corrections, Parole, and Probation     Mar 14, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 04, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 18, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 204   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 204.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 19, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 135.
  • Effective May 26, 2017.