AB266 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 07, 2017.
By: Taxation

Provides for a deduction from certain taxes for certain wages paid by an employer under a qualifying paid family medical leave policy. (BDR 32-709)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 30, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 13, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 25, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 580   

Bill History

Mar 07, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 08, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 580.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)