AB273 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 09, 2017.
By: Education

Requires certain school districts to collect and report the height and weight of certain pupils. (BDR 34-353)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar 08, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Mar 20, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 09, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 10, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)