AB278 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pickard, Hambrick, Cohen, Elliot Anderson, Paul Anderson, Ellison, Tolles, Wheeler, Harris

Revises provisions relating to the support of children. (BDR 11-892)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 371.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 30, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass, as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 24, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May 30, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 400   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 400.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 31, 2017

Jun 01, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 371.

Sections 4 to 8, inclusive, and 14 of this act effective June 4, 2017. Sections 1, 2, 3, and 9 to 13, inclusive, of this act effective on the effective date of the regulations adopted by the Administrator of the Division of Welfare and Supportive Services of the Department of Health and Human Services establishing the guidelines in this State for the support of one or more children pursuant to section 8 of this act.