AB292 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 14, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carrillo, Fumo, Ohrenschall, Joiner, Swank, Manendo

Revises provisions relating to bullying and cyber-bullying in public schools. (BDR 34-916)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     May 04, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Education     May 11, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     May 18, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 31,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 476     Amend. No. 850   

Bill History

Mar 14, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 476.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 850.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.

May 25, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 850 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 278.

Effective July 1, 2017.